TX HB1020 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the use, exhibition, or possession of a firearm by public school students participating in certain school-sponsored programs and activities sponsored or supported by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to the use, exhibition, or possession of a firearm by public school students participating in certain school-sponsored programs and activities sponsored or supported by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Terri Hodge [D] |
Rep. Carl Isett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-20 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Education | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-02 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-02 | Amended | |
2009-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-03 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
SHOOTING RANGES
Weapons
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
SHOOTING RANGES
Weapons