TX HB1014 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#340 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19HouseRecord vote
2017-04-19HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Pensions
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-01-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback