TX HB1011 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exempting certain honorably retired peace officers from continuing education requirements.
Title
Relating to exempting certain honorably retired peace officers from continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1397 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . August 26, 2019
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
PEACE OFFICERS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
PEACE OFFICERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1011 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01011I.htm |