TX HB1005 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requisites of a bail bond given by certain defendants and to conditions of release on bond for certain defendants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requisites of a bail bond given by certain defendants and to conditions of release on bond for certain defendants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#452 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#452
2021-04-27HousePassed
2021-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB317 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1005
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01005I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01005H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01005E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01005S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01005F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01005I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01005H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01005H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01005E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01005E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1005&RcdVtNo=452&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments 750

feedback