TX HB1003 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to notice provided to certain victims or witnesses regarding certain inmates or defendants who are electronically monitored.
Title
Relating to notice provided to certain victims or witnesses regarding certain inmates or defendants who are electronically monitored.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-15 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-03 | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION