TX HB10 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the regulation of residential mortgage loan originators; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of residential mortgage loan originators; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-27 | Amended | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-02-18 | Correction in referral | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
MORTGAGE LOAN ORIGINATORS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
TEXAS SECURE & FAIR ENFORCEMENT FOR MORTGAGE LICENSING ACT
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
MORTGAGE LOAN ORIGINATORS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
TEXAS SECURE & FAIR ENFORCEMENT FOR MORTGAGE LICENSING ACT