TN SR9001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Restaurant
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize and commend Sunset Restaurant and owners Bob and Virginia Hodge for many years of service to the citizens of Lebanon.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/29/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |