TN SR8004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Harold E. Fisher
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Harold E. Fisher of Spring City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |