TN SR0259 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Trudy Bell Langford
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Trudy Bell Langford for exemplary service as a legislative intern.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |