TN SR0221 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Legislative Administration of the 110th General Assembly

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Legislative Administration of the 110th General Assembly

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-05-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-25SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback