TN SR0202 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Alexius Brunson, Salutatorian, Memphis Central High School
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Alexius Brunson, 2022 Salutatorian of Memphis Central High School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |