TN SR0195 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Josephine Redfearn Oliver Teague Ingle
Title
Josephine Redfearn Oliver Teague Ingle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |