TN SR0190 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Braise Killen
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend and congratulate Braise Killen, winner of the Shoals Talent Search Contest.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |