TN SR0170 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Barry Stephenson, Tennessee Board of Regents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Barry Stephenson to the Tennessee board of regents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-02-13SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2024-02-12SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2024-02-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/12/2024
2024-02-07SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2024-01-31SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/7/2024
2024-01-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-01-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2024-01-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback