TN SR0169 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. James G. Gurney
Title
Dr. James G. Gurney
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SR0169&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SR0169.pdf |