TN SR0166 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies and approves the amendments and revisions to the Tennessee Rules of Criminal Procedure, as promulgated and adopted by the Tennessee Supreme Court.
Title
Ratifies and approves the amendments and revisions to the Tennessee Rules of Criminal Procedure, as promulgated and adopted by the Tennessee Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |