TN SR0156 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Melissa Collins, Tennessee Teacher of the Year
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Dr. Melissa Collins on her selection as the 2022–2023 Tennessee Teacher of the Year.
Sponsors
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Brent Taylor [R] |
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Sen. Randy McNally [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |