TN SR0150 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Department of Education to include ACT/SAT participation rates for each LEA on the annual report card.
Title
Urges the Department of Education to include ACT/SAT participation rates for each LEA on the annual report card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |