TN SR0141 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies and approves the amendments and revisions to the Tennessee Rules of Civil Procedure as promulgated by the Supreme Court.
Title
Ratifies and approves the amendments and revisions to the Tennessee Rules of Civil Procedure as promulgated by the Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 3/17/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |