TN SR0136 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Lowell Russell, Tennessee Peace Officers Standards and Training (POST) Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lowell Russell, Tennessee Peace Officers Standards and Training (POST) Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: recommend for Adoption (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-12SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2018-02-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-02-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/12/2018
2018-02-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-06SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/6/2018
2018-01-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-10-30SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback