TN SR0129 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the University of Tennessee Board of Trustees to require the collection of an objective metric of postsecondary readiness assessment scores as a part of their application process.
Title
A RESOLUTION to urge the University of Tennessee board of trustees to require the collection of an objective metric of postsecondary readiness assessment scores as a part of their student application process.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm. 3/16/22 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |