TN SR0120 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Elliana Ceizyk

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commend Elliana Ceizyk for exemplary service as a legislative intern.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-21SenateAdopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/21/2023
2023-04-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-04-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback