TN SR0092 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Don Spain Media Gallery," Senate Hearing Room I in Cordell Hull Building
Title
"Don Spain Media Gallery," Senate Hearing Room I in Cordell Hull Building
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |