TN SR0083 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee State Museum, 85th anniversary
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the Tennessee State Museum on the occasion of its eighty-fifth anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/31/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |