TN SR0076 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Matthew Walker Comprehensive Health Center, 55th anniversary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize the legacy of Dr. Matthew Walker and the fifty-fifth anniversary of Matthew Walker Comprehensive Health Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-03SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-04-03SenateAdopted, Ayes 0, Nays 0
2023-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-03-20SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback