TN SR0075 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 2023 as "County Government Month" in Tennessee.
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate April 2023 as "County Government Month" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |