TN SR0038 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Christie Pennington, Chester County Teacher of the Year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Christie Pennington on her selection as a 2022–2023 Chester County Teacher of the Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-16SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/16/2023
2023-03-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-03-06SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback