TN SR0024 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

100th anniversary of the ratification of the 19th Amendment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

100th anniversary of the ratification of the 19th Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-01SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-28SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback