TN SR0022 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Instructs Tennessee's public universities to work with athletic conferences in opposition to NCAA's prohibition on compensation of student athletes and work for repeal of related rules and policies.
Title
Instructs Tennessee's public universities to work with athletic conferences in opposition to NCAA's prohibition on compensation of student athletes and work for repeal of related rules and policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 1 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 4/3/2019 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 1 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 4/3/2019 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 4 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0385) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 1 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |