TN SR0021 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Speaker of the House of Representatives to appoint a committee to meet with a like committee from the Senate to consider the removal of Ellen Hobbs Lyle from the office of Chancellor of the Twentieth Judicial District by the Tennessee General Assembly acting pursuant to Article VI, Section 6 of the Constitution of Tennessee.
Title
A RESOLUTION to authorize the Speaker of the Senate to appoint a committee to meet with a like committee from the House of Representatives to consider the removal of Ellen Hobbs Lyle from the office of Chancellor of the Twentieth Judicial District by the Tennessee General Assembly acting pursuant to Article VI, Section 6 of the Constitution of Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SR0021&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SR0021.pdf |