TN SR0010 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Multiple System Atrophy Awareness Month," March 2019
Title
"Multiple System Atrophy Awareness Month," March 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |