TN SJR8027 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-26 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Adjourns sine die the Second Extraordinary Session of the 111th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourns sine die the Second Extraordinary Session of the 111th General Assembly.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-08-18SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-08-13SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-08-12HouseR/S Concurred, v.v.
2020-08-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-08-12SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2020-08-12SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback