TN SJR8022 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Benjamin D. Caton III, Teacher of the Year, Tennessee Music Teachers Association
Title
Dr. Benjamin D. Caton III, Teacher of the Year, Tennessee Music Teachers Association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-08-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-08-12 | House | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-08-12 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |