TN SJR8014 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Objected to on Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Objected to on Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Farmers Cooperative, 75th anniversary
Title
Tennessee Farmers Cooperative, 75th anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-11 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 8/12/20 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/11/2020 |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |