TN SJR8008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Trooper Aaron Rumford,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Trooper Aaron Rumford of the Tennessee Highway Patrol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-10-25SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-10-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-10-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-10-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-10-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-10-20HouseConcurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-10-20HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. No. 2 for 10/20/21
2021-10-20SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-10-20SenateAdopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2021-10-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-10-19SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/20/2021
2021-10-19SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback