TN SJR7140 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Objected to on Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jim Jaggers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Jim Jaggers on the occasion of his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-29HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2023-08-29HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 8/29/2023
2023-08-28HouseHeld on desk.
2023-08-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/28/2023
2023-08-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-24HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2023-08-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-24HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 8/24/2023
2023-08-24SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-08-24SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2023-08-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/24/2023
2023-08-23SenateRefer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-08-23SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback