TN SJR7091 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Objected to on Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Kramer Rayson LLP, 75th anniversary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Kramer Rayson LLP on the occasion of its seventy-fifth anniversary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-29HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2023-08-29HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 8/29/2023
2023-08-28HouseHeld on desk.
2023-08-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/28/2023
2023-08-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-24HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2023-08-23HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 8/24/2023
2023-08-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-08-23SenateAdopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2023-08-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/23/2023
2023-08-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-08-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-08-21SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback