TN SJR7001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Mayor Ed Hagerty

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commend Ed Hagerty for his honorable and astute service to the people of Tennessee as mayor of the City of Mt. Juliet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-01-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-01-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-01-22HouseConcurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-01-21HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/22/21
2021-01-21SenateAdopted, Ayes 24, Nays 0
2021-01-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback