TN SJR1804 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Mike Bell
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Mike Bell for his honorable service to the people of Tennessee, despite being a member of the Senate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |