TN SJR1774 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Colonel Rex A. Ameigh, Tennessee State Guard
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize Colonel Rex A. Ameigh on the occasion of his retirement from the Tennessee State Guard.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/27/22 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |