TN SJR1479 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
International Maternal Health and Rights Day, April 11, 2022
Title
A RESOLUTION to commemorate International Maternal Health and Rights Day, April 11, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1479&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SJR1479.pdf |