TN SJR1364 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Department of Education and the Department of Safety and Homeland Security to compile a list of threats to public schools in Tennessee.
Title
A RESOLUTION to urge the Department of Education and the Department of Safety and Homeland Security to compile a list of threats to public schools in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |