TN SJR1310 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jake Wilson, Sumner County Middle School Teacher of the Year
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Jake Wilson on his selection as the 2023–2024 Ellis Middle School Teacher of the Year and the Sumner County Middle School Teacher of the Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-08 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |