TN SJR1147 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges disconnecting Russian banks from SWIFT, expelling Russian diplomats from U.S., and banning Russian imports.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to sanctions against Russia for its invasion of Ukraine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-28 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |