TN SJR1087 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Elizabeth B. Brown, 80th birthday
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize and honor Elizabeth B. Brown on the occasion of her eightieth birthday.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended, Adopted, voice vote |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |