TN SJR1009 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Bring Your Pet to the Legislature Day, March 17, 2020
Title
Bring Your Pet to the Legislature Day, March 17, 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Held on desk. |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-02 | House | R/S Ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 2/25/20 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |