TN SJR0976 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Lang Wiseman, UT board of trustees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lang Wiseman, UT board of trustees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-05-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-25HouseConcurred, Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 0
2018-04-25SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-24SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-24SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. 4/24/18
2018-04-23SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback