TN SJR0965 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Kendal Aleeann Johnson, Valedictorian, Clay County High School
Title
Kendal Aleeann Johnson, Valedictorian, Clay County High School
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-25 | House | Concurred, Ayes 81, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-24 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 4/25/18 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |