TN SJR0931 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jeni West, Dr. William Burris Elementary at Drakes Creek, Teacher of the Year
Title
Jeni West, Dr. William Burris Elementary at Drakes Creek, Teacher of the Year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-02-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2-27-20 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |