TN SJR0929 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sara O'Meara Day
Title
A RESOLUTION to commemorate September 9, 2024, as "Sara O'Meara Day" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |